Financial history DARTMOOR PRESERVATION ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1182974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £113.65k £155.31k £155.31k £192.05k £192.05k
Total expenditure £81.83k £110.68k £110.68k £184.09k £184.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A