Harrogate and Knaresborough District of Sanctuary

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to help refugees and asylum seekers who come to live in the Harrogate and Knaresborough district by offering friendship, practical support and educational experiences. We strive to raise awareness about the issues faced by refugees, and we also campaign for a humane asylum system by lobbying local and national politicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £23,470 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 April 2019: Standard registration
- HDS (Working name)
- HARROGATE DISTRICT OF SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Adele Bond | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Gibson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Gardner | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Tamanna Krami | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Harris | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Dennis Brickles BA, PGCE | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £9.45k | £25.59k | £34.53k | £31.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £5.94k | £17.31k | £36.86k | £25.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.53k | £23.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 17 APR 2019 as amended on 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, ESPECIALLY IN HARROGATE, ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM B. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES C. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND ENGAGEMENT BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS D. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN HARROGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37C Kent Road
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG1 2ET
- Phone:
- 01423 564207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window