Financial history THE WANDERING MINSTRELS

Charity number: 1183531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £684 £0 £5.10k £5.60k £5.53k
Total expenditure £520 £48 £4.60k £5.65k £5.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A