THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GLEADLESS VALLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Know God through Jesus Christ, Explore life together as a church, Reach out to Gleadless Valley in Sheffield and beyond. Through: Sunday and mid-week worship, bible study & prayer, Pastoral care and guidance within the ethnically & culturally diverse community, Youth and children ministry, Baby & Toddler group, Monthly cafe in the community, Partnership with local stakeholders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 August 2018: Standard registration
- Gleadless Valley Parish Church Holy Cross (Working name)
- HOLY CROSS GLEADLESS VALLEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID JEREMY MIDDLETON | Chair | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hugh Wallace | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Rich | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunday Dawodu | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Murorunkwere | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy StJohn Lachlan | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Spence | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Melanie Claire Hobbs | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Aboagye | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emeka Kingsley Okereke | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BURTENSHAW CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PIERRE KABAYA | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.13k | £120.35k | £72.52k | £63.63k | £80.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.96k | £90.89k | £66.33k | £68.23k | £100.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Blackstock Close
Sheffield
S14 1AE
- Phone:
- 01142393808
- Email:
- church@hcgv.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window