POOLE METHODISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious, social community and pastoral activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £5,908 from 1 government contract(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 28 June 2018: Standard registration
- POOLE METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Walter John Albert Beasley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sherry-Lynn Gerard-Tofts | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HARLEY BAKER | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roberto Alves Viana | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stigwood | Trustee | 04 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARGARET DAVIS | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Le Poidevin | Trustee | 24 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
RONALD GEORGE BALMER | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
EIFRON HOPPER | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev ANTONY JOHN CAVANAGH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
EDNA MAY DANIELS | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HILDA MARY BEDDARD | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATE WHITE | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN EDITH MATTHEWS | Trustee | 15 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
BASIL KENNETH MATTHEWS | Trustee | 11 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
EVELINE MARION LE POIDEVIN | Trustee | 11 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANNE GIBBS | Trustee | 11 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN REDWOOD | Trustee | 20 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.56k | £128.00k | £121.23k | £126.57k | £225.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.61k | £153.52k | £118.57k | £164.45k | £201.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.75k | £5.24k | £9.50k | £5.78k | £5.91k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POOLE METHODISTS
THE SPIRE
HIGH STREET
POOLE
BH15 1DF
- Phone:
- 01202916520
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window