UP - The Adult Cerebral Palsy Movement

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting better services for adults with Cerebral Palsy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 August 2018: CIO registration
- UP - The Adult Cerebral Palsy Movement (Working name)
- ADULT CEREBRAL PALSY HUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA LIVINGSTONE | Chair | 06 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Professor Krishnan Padmakumari Sivaraman Nair MBBS MD DM | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Ryan | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Melvyn Edward Jacobs OBE | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Stevenson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM CREEGER | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEREK LIVINGSTONE | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.59k | £6.97k | £18.93k | £45.06k | £53.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.09k | £14.66k | £12.29k | £46.60k | £57.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2018 as amended on 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ADULT SUFFERERS OF CEREBRAL PALSY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; 2. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, RELEVANT MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL PROFESSIONALS AND RELATED AND RELEVANT DISCIPLINES IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CEREBRAL PALSY BY WORKING WITH MEDICAL AND RESEARCH COMMUNITIES TO PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE IN THE TREATMENT, CARE, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF ADULTS WITH CEREBRAL PALSY; 3. TO ENCOURAGE ADULTS AFFECTED BY CEREBRAL PALSY TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL LIFE POTENTIAL AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO CEREBRAL PALSY IN ADULTS AND ALLIED CONDITIONS AND TO PROMOTE THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS; AND 5. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS, FRIENDS AND CARERS AND OTHER PERSONS AFFECTED BY CEREBRAL PALSY, IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAYLOR ASSOCIATES
GALLERY COURT
28 ARCADIA AVENUE
LONDON
N3 2FG
- Phone:
- 02084469202
- Email:
- hello@upmovement.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window