REGENT'S PARK COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COLLEGE AIMS TO PROVIDE MEN AND WOMEN WITH HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND HUMANITIES AT UNDERGRADUATE, GRADUATE AND RESEARCH LEVEL AS PART OF A WORLD-CLASS UNIVERSITY, AND IN THE CONTEXT OF CHRISTIAN PASTORAL CARE. IT PROVIDES SPECIAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE STUDY OF THEOLOGY AND RELIGION, INCLUDING PREPARATION FOR ORDAINED CHRISTIAN MINISTRY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,196,000
Donations and legacies | £376.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.68m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £143.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,691,000
Raising funds | £75.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.62m | |
Other | £0 |
-£167,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £75.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.62m | |
Retained for future use | £505.00k |
People

64 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 October 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charles Philip Read | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Jeffrey Fitzgerald | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Wale Aremu Hudson-Roberts | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Elizabeth Jane Allison-Glenny | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN JAMES COWBURN | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANTHONY JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
REV CAROL ANN MURRAY | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Christine Elizabeth Joynes | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Austin Lafferty | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev STEPHEN LEONARD COPSON | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Timothy Mark Pottle | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Kang-San Tan | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Jonathan Mark Keyworth | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Andrew John Bevan | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sir Malcolm David Evans | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Anthony William Harris | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Andrew John Openshaw | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Peter Plamenoff Petkoff | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Katherine Ann Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Carroll Douglas Stevens | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
REV Paul Robert George Burnish | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.40m | £2.50m | £2.68m | £3.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.02m | £2.21m | £2.74m | £2.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £72.00k | £58.00k | £3.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £563.00k | £797.00k | £414.00k | £376.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.74m | £1.60m | £2.23m | £2.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £14.00k | £14.00k | £103.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £116.00k | £118.00k | £133.00k | £143.00k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.00k | £247.00k | £72.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.95m | £2.12m | £2.66m | £2.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £69.00k | £90.00k | £88.00k | £75.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £34.00k | £33.00k | £27.00k | £31.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £5.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £21.16m | £21.34m | £29.13m | £18.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £5.99m | £7.44m | £7.82k | £10.05m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £1.06m | £1.06m | £1.19m | £1.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | -£409.00k | -£408.00k | -£643.00k | -£291.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £422.00k | £408.00k | £779.00k | £569.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 OCT 2018 as amended on 10 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF A PERMANENT PRIVATE HALL LICENSED BY THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD OR A COLLEGE OR SOCIETY WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE, IN WHICH MEN AND WOMEN MAY: 3.1.1 ENGAGE IN STUDY (INCLUDING FOR DEGREES, DIPLOMAS AND CERTIFICATES OF THE UNIVERSITY); 3.1.2 STUDY THEOLOGY AND PREPARE FOR ORDAINED CHRISTIAN MINISTRY, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST BAPTIST CHURCHES; AND 3.1.3 ENGAGE IN RESEARCH. THE COLLEGE, PERMANENT PRIVATE HALL OR SOCIETY SHALL PROVIDE ALL ITS STUDENTS WITH HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE CONTEXT OF A COMMUNITY WHICH OFFERS OPPORTUNITIES TO GROW IN CHRISTIAN FAITH AND SERVICE, AND TO DEVELOP CHRISTIAN THINKING ABOUT ACADEMIC SUBJECTS AND VOCATIONS IN SOCIETY. 3.2 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING LIFE-LONG CHRISTIAN LEARNING AMONGST MEMBERS OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG MEMBERS OF BAPTIST CHURCHES.
Linked charities
- 23 October 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
REGENTS PARK COLLEGE
PUSEY STREET
OXFORD
OX1 2LB
- Phone:
- 01865288120
- Email:
- enquiries@regents.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window