Financial history National Philanthropic Trust UK Limited

Charity number: 1181128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.61m £52.43m £40.69m £29.36m £109.76m
Total expenditure £881.02k £9.40m £9.75m £16.99m £27.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.60m £52.26m £39.89m £27.49m £106.75m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.95k £47.04k £522.72k £1.22m £2.31m
Income - Other £12.68k £120.76k £277.31k £645.68k £698.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £818.00k £9.32m £9.53m £16.66m £27.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £63.01k £81.99k £213.35k £326.15k £371.96k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £2.00k £2.00k £75.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £789.14k £9.12m £9.25m £16.24m £27.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £250 £25.78k £99.32k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0