Accounts and annual returns CHESTERFIELD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 512769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 October 2020 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required