BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET THIRD SECTOR GROUP CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3SG is a membership network for third sector organisations operating in Bath and North East Somerset and our aim is to raise the profile of our members and give them a chance to influence local strategic decision making. We also run and share relevant events, training and disseminate information and post job opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,602 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 06 December 2018: CIO registration
- 3SG (Working name)
- B&NES 3SG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Halena Coury | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Allen | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Hillier | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE HAWORTH | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICKY TEW | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATE MORTON | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.42k | £229.24k | £170.72k | £235.12k | £129.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.41k | £182.56k | £149.87k | £175.23k | £150.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £35.85k | N/A | £41.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. (2) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. "THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. “CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND “SOCIAL ENTERPRISES” ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Archway Office
4-5 Chapel Court
BATH
BA1 1SQ
- Phone:
- 01225 683087
- Email:
- Contact@3sg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window