BELMONT EXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities are Christian worship for all ages, and activities which include Parent & Toddler groups, youth groups, retired groups, parenting courses, sessions for vulnerable families and English classes for ethnic minorities. The church also trains and encourages members to become involved in the propagation of the christian faith both locally and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 09 August 2019: Standard registration
- 23 February 2022: Funds received from 1079412 TRUST FUND HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BELMONT CHAPEL
- BELMONT (Working name)
- BELMONT CHAPEL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN NAISH | Chair | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clive Richards | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CLIVE HUGHES | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Graham Winfield | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Maralyn Luckham | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cyril David Northcote-Passmore | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|||||
ALISTAIR HERON | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|||||
PAUL PHILLIPS | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Hannah Louise Stevens | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Airdrie | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.63k | £413.10k | £420.16k | £427.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £402.29k | £433.77k | £432.64k | £428.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN EXETER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (
Contact information
- Address:
-
Belmont Chapel
Western Way
EXETER
EX1 2DB
- Phone:
- 01392 258029
- Email:
- office@belmontexeter.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window