GRATITUDE INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gratitude
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 November 2018: CIO registration
- 07 April 2025: Funds received from 1177915 LIFE FESTIVAL ENTERPRISE
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Revd Richard Charles Thorpe | Chair | 03 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Vice President Allan Merwin Barth | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Celia Apegyei-Collins | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Harvey Collins Kwiyani | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.40k | £41.00k | £8.59k | £5.94k | £629 | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.37k | £32.60k | £35.70k | £7.72k | £529 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, IN THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY BY:- 4.1. ENCOURAGING THE SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE TO PROMOTE MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND RACIAL GROUPS; 4.2. WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE OR FAITH; AND 4.3. ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT OF GOOD RELATIONS AND SOCIAL COHESION BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL OR FAITH GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 VERDANT LANE
LONDON
SE6 1JD
- Phone:
- 07506917869
- Email:
- gratitude2018@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window