Financial history FRIENDS OF NUTTALL PARK

Charity number: 1181981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.19k £14.13k £20.99k £22.26k £20.47k
Total expenditure £7.55k £9.58k £14.13k £32.50k £22.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A