NORTH EAST WALES SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve suffering and distress amongst persons endangered by accidents or natural hazards, and to assist in the saving of lives and the relief of distress by the provision of efficient, trained resources to relevant organisations for the search and rescue of missing and/or vulnerable people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 10 August 1982: Standard registration
- 05 December 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1192256 NORTH EAST WALES SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM
- N E W S A R (Working name)
- CLWYD RESCUE TEAM (Previous name)
- NORTH EAST WALES SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM NEWSAR (THE TEAM) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.21k | £65.08k | £52.75k | £154.36k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.72k | £25.85k | £38.36k | £44.81k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS, AND TO ASSIST IN THE SAVING OF LIVES AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF EFFICIENT, TRAINED RESOURCES TO RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS FOR THE SEARCH AND RESCUE OF MISSING AND/OR VULNERABLE PEOPLE. (B) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE IN THE PRIMARY AREA OF OPERATION OF THE TEAM - THIS WILL BE THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF NORTH EAST WALES AND CHESHIRE. THE SECONDARY AREA SHALL BE THE REMAINDER OF NORTH WALES, THE COUNTIES OF MID WALES AND THE ENGLISH COUNTIES ADJOINING THE PRIMARY AREA. THEREAFTER THE TEAM MAY RENDER ASSISTANCE IN THE REMAINDER OF THE BRITISH ISLES AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS REQUESTED
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CLWYD AND OTHER AREAS AS DEFINED IN CONSTITUTION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window