THE KOBY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Koby Foundation is now a registered charity No# 1184500. It received its name after a little boy called Koby died suffering from serious injuries and malnutrition. Since then Marie Willis has been working with our friend Sala in Amasaman,a poor suburb of Accra Ghana. Children are fed and schooled on a daily basis and given advantages beyond their reach with much success.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
Governance
- 19 July 2019: CIO registration
- 24 February 2023: Funds received from 507238 THE PENTECOSTAL EVENTIDE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER TRESCO WILLIS | Chair | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lynne Hitchcock | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA NAOMI POZNANSKI | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIE ANN WILLIS | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMILY ELIZABETH WILLIS | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.72k | £76.40k | £54.89k | £47.33k | £64.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.14k | £31.02k | £40.62k | £41.48k | £71.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GHANA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN GHANA THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Rockcliffe Grange
MANSFIELD
NG18 4YW
- Phone:
- 07768110733
- Email:
- rogertwillis1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window