Financial history COTSWOLD PLAYERS

Charity number: 1180835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £85.78k £44.06k £364.64k £86.47k £103.58k
Total expenditure £57.95k £60.84k £91.64k £98.33k £81.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.14k £2.67k N/A N/A