THE FISHERMEAD TRINITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The benefit of the people of Fishermead and the neighbouring estates, without distinction of sex, race or political, religious or other opinions by collaborating with other groups or individuals to advance education & provide facilities for recreation, leisure time with the object of improving life & the advancement of the Christian religion by C of E, Methodist Church, URC & Baptist Union.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 13 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Mahon | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Ronald Petchey | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ian Charles Herbert | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Darron James Kendrick | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
(1)THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FISHERMEAD, MILTON KEYNES, AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, THE METHODIST CHURCH, THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH AND THE BAPTIST UNION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, THE METHODIST CHURCH, THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH AND THE BAPTIST UNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity Centre
Fishermead Boulevard
Fishermead
MILTON KEYNES
MK6 2LA
- Phone:
- 01908660401
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window