THE WALKERGATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Walkergate Trust supports the advancement of the Christian faith in the United Kingdom or the world, in particular but not exclusively by supporting the work of Hope Church Tyneside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 20 February 2019: CIO registration
- 23 July 2019: Funds received from 1091424 THE WALKERGATE TRUST
- Hope Church Tyneside (Working name)
- Hope Church, Wallsend (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY RODERICK LETTS | Chair | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW KEILLER | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Roger Lovelock | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||
PAMELA MARY BELL | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA SHARON SANDERS | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.77k | £48.22k | £62.61k | £43.32k | £47.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.04k | £39.46k | £28.14k | £54.86k | £64.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 20 FEB 2019 AMENDED ON 15 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUR STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF HOPE CHURCH TYNESIDE; 4.1.2 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 BARONSWOOD
GOSFORTH
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 3UB
- Phone:
- 0191 695 4093
- Email:
- thewalkergatetrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window