256TH BRISTOL CHRISTCHURCH HENGROVE SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. We encourage our young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, the 256th Christchurch Hengrove Scout Group give young people of South Bristol the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 26 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Carter | Chair | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Conor David Ogilvie-Davidson | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Bethany Haines | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hartrey | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Fumpson | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Simon Featherstone | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.57k | £7.13k | £18.29k | £14.24k | £14.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.99k | £9.56k | £15.56k | £28.53k | £17.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £629 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCOUT HQ AT REAR OF CHRIST CHURCH
PETHERTON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS14 9BP
- Phone:
- 07954100558
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window