PONTEFRACT CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-political independent organisation monitoring planning, land use, regeneration, tourism, civic pride, heritage, and business, raising awareness to the people of Pontefract and district. Raising the profile of Pontefract as a place to live, work, do business and visit, by protecting and enhancing the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 11 February 1983: Standard registration
- 19 October 2016: Funds received from 1120733 PONTEFRACT GROUPS TOGETHER
- PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT CIVIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Cartwright | Chair |
|
||||||
Evelyn Westwood | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ferrari | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Cook | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Hogg | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wood | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr COLIN WHITE | Trustee | 29 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.05k | £19.36k | £12.07k | £25.90k | £25.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.91k | £17.40k | £15.92k | £36.30k | £19.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.94k | N/A | £335 | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 12 JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED 11 APRIL 2001. CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3) TO SECURE TH PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Mill Hill Avenue
PONTEFRACT
West Yorkshire
WF8 4JH
- Phone:
- 01977 708658
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window