AVON TENNIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, support and deliver tennis playing opportunities for all members of the public in our unitary authority areas of Bath & NE Somerset, Bristol City, North Somerset, and South Gloucestershire, and to make it inclusive and appealing to all sections of the community. To do this we engage with Tennis Clubs, Education Establishments, other Venues, Qualified Coaches, and run Competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 March 2020: CIO registration
- AVON LTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Forgan Curling | Chair | 06 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Norwood | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Weeks | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles John Bendall | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Alexander | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.54k | £76.10k | £167.52k | £274.94k | £269.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.60k | £101.50k | £196.71k | £220.07k | £252.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Mar 2020 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AVON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coombe Dingle Sports Centre
Coombe Lane
Bristol
BS9 2BJ
- Phone:
- 07479260615
- Email:
- tennis@avontennis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window