THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' CHURCH HAMSTERLEY, COUNTY DURHAM

Charity Number: 1184033
Charity reporting is up to date (174 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Through targeted fundraising and by seeking donations and legacies, the charity exists to advance culture and heritage in and around Hamsterley, County Durham by assisting in the preservation, maintenance, repair and improvement of the fabric, fittings and contents of the church of St. James, Hamsterley together with its surrounding access roads, paths and grounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,262
Total expenditure: £37

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dominic Richard Noel Bayne Chair 21 June 2019
None on record
Neil Holloway Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Barbara-Helen Carter-Ward Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Julieanne Weir Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Marney Jane Swan Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
KATHERINE ANNE BONAS Trustee 21 June 2019
THE OTJIKONDO SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Graham Ward Trustee 21 June 2019
THE ASSOCIATION OF ENGLISH CATHEDRALS
Received: On time
Kira Stephanie Juliette Larno-Bayne Trustee 21 June 2019
None on record
Ady Davis Trustee 21 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £9.00k £3.32k £1.28k £1.26k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £375 £1.65k £37
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2025 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 April 2025 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 March 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 March 2024 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 February 2023 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 February 2023 118 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 April 2021 154 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Orchard View
Hamsterley
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL13 3PP
Phone:
01388488833
Website:

No information available