THE GERMAN CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION (LONDON) CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith by developing and supporting initiatives which reflect and/or promote Christian values. Providing general support for churches of all denominations in particular to our local churches in Bayswater and German churches throughout the UK. To provide or assist in the provision of social welfare, cultural activities, educational, recreation and leisure facilities for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Payne | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
DIETER LOSSE | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Halsey | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
ANGELA FOX | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTIAN DAUR | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2025 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2025 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 252 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING PEOPLE ALONG THE PATH TO A CHRISTIAN WAY OF LIFE, BY RAISING AWARENESS OF CHRISTIAN VALUES AND THE NEEDS OF OTHERS, AND BY DEVELOPING AND SUPPORTING INITIATIVES WHICH REFLECT AND/OR PROMOTE CHRISTIAN VALUES; (B) TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS FAITH, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING GENERAL SUPPORT FOR CHURCHES OF ALL DENOMINATIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) OUR LOCAL CHURCHES IN BAYSWATER AND GERMAN CHURCHES THROUGHOUT THE UK; (C) TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, OR OTHERWISE SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND PROGRAMMES, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR CULTURAL ACTIVITY, RECREATION AND LEISURE, FOR PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES OR PROGRAMMES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SAID PEOPLE. (D) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT, ADVICE, OPPORTUNITIES FOR FELLOWSHIP AND OTHER SERVICES AND MATERIAL SUPPORT TO, AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF, INDIVIDUALS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL, ECONOMIC OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES; (E) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; (F) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, LECTURES, DISCUSSION GROUPS, LANGUAGE CLASSES, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, DESIGNED TO PROMOTE CULTURAL EXCHANGES AND A MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND THEIR CULTURES, ESPECIALLY BETWEEN GERMANY AND THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GERMAN YMCA
35 CRAVEN TERRACE
LONDON
W2 3EL
- Phone:
- 02077239276
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window