Financial history POTENTIAL KIDS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1182917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £42.95k £52.62k £74.38k £53.62k £102.42k
Total expenditure £27.09k £33.11k £41.58k £62.17k £82.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £1.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £29.64k £9.84k £6.90k £4.29k