THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, KIRDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a place of worship, generally advances and educates people about religion. Provides pastoral care and outreach. All within the Christianity of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 March 2019: Standard registration
- PCC KIRDFORD WITH PLAISTOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Harris | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Phyllis Phillips | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Weston | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ann Humphreys | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Slade | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Lesley Stoner | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Anne Osborne | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lance Anthony Oelman | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev CLIVE RONALD JENKINS | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard David Arthur Burge | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Carol Smart | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Gillian Nutting | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Sorton | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Valerie Bowman | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Janice Taylor | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.33k | £100.02k | £100.01k | £89.53k | £104.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.76k | £73.01k | £75.34k | £98.71k | £84.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £2.00k | N/A | £2.50k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John the Baptist Church
Glasshouse Lane
Kirdford
West Sussex
RH14 0LT
- Phone:
- 01403700339
- Email:
- vicarage@stpeterswg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window