Accounts and annual returns Telford Mind

Charity number: 1186627
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 May 2025 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 May 2025 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2025 464 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2025 464 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 February 2023 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 February 2023 371 days late Download Open in new window