BRIGHTON PHOENIX ATHLETICS AND TRIATHLON CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit in Brighton and the surrounding area by providing facilities for athletics, triathlon and other sports capable of promoting physical health and fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Townley | Chair | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Nigel Lambe | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Abigale Bunning | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darryl Hards | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Kemp | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.40k | £12.85k | £11.69k | £24.83k | £31.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.18k | £12.49k | £18.76k | £23.54k | £23.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2025 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2025 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2023 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BRIGHTON PHOENIX ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRIGHTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS, TRIATHLON AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “FACILITIES” MEANS ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES, PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, BUILDINGS AND LAND, OFFERING COACHING IN ATHLETICS AND TRIATHLON AND OTHER SPORTS, PROVIDING TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN RACES AND COMPETITIONS OF DIFFERENT TYPES, PROVIDING SUPPORT AND EDUCATION SPECIFICALLY RELATING TO TRAINING FOR AND COMPETING IN ATHLETICS AND TRIATHLON AND OTHER SPORTS ON AN AMATEUR BASIS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Payne Avenue
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 5HD
- Phone:
- 07899792461
- Email:
- mtownleym@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window