CHILDREN'S BOOK PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our object is to advance education of children up to age 14 by supplying books to those that would not otherwise be able to afford them, and by creating sustainable reading communities amongst targeted groups through the provision of regular inclusive book gifting events. Also to advance public education about environmental matters related to re-use & recycling of pre-loved children's books.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 April 2019: CIO registration
- 25 February 2025: Funds received from 205943 THE CITY AND METROPOLITAN WELFARE CHARITY
- London Children's Book Project (Working name)
- LONDON CHILDREN'S BOOK PROJECT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Shepard | Chair | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Remi Baker | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Dobson | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mannix | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Norton | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Harrington | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.32k | £58.97k | £81.61k | £192.80k | £362.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £39.74k | £69.68k | £129.48k | £250.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.57k | £558 | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2019 as amended on 29 Apr 2020 as amended on 29 Apr 2020 as amended on 06 Feb 2024 as amended on 07 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF BABIES, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 0-14 YEARS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY GIFTING GOOD QUALITY, RELEVANT, RE-HOMED BOOKS TO CHILDREN WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO AFFORD THEM, AND BY CREATING SUSTAINABLE READING COMMUNITIES AMONGST TARGETED GROUPS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF REGULAR INCLUSIVE BOOK GIFTING EVENTS. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS RELATED TO RE-USE AND RECYCLING OF PRE-LOVED CHILDREN?S BOOKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Bassein Park Road
LONDON
W12 9RN
- Phone:
- 07968064118
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window