METROLAND CULTURE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Metroland Cultures works to build, maintain and share art and culture in Brent. We amplify and support the communities who are already telling their stories of life here in Brent, and work with artists and ideas to help tell new ones.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£584,618
Donations and legacies | £28.76k | |
Charitable activities | £555.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £862 |
Total expenditure:
£401,157
Raising funds | £17.41k | |
Charitable activities | £383.75k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £383.75k | |
Retained for future use | £183.46k |
People

7 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 September 2019: Standard registration
- 20 March 2024: Funds received from 1180114 ARTISTS IN RESIDENCE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Turab Shah | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Saad | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Prempeh | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moira Kristina Sybille Lacelles | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Parker Barnes | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Aderonke Johnson | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roshni Hirani | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Dedman | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Holt | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIGBY LAURENCE SPENCE HALSBY | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73m | £593.91k | £631.69k | £584.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10m | £570.12k | £1.14m | £401.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £520.00k | £420.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.81m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.81m | £0 | £0 | £28.76k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £627.53k | £593.91k | £630.02k | £555.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £291.67k | £0 | £1.66k | £862 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.30m | £552.67k | £1.12m | £383.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £800.71k | £17.45k | £17.70k | £17.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £9.10k | £10.09k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £8.11k | £5.41k | £3.61k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.24m | £1.31m | £585.12k | £606.97k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £539.51k | £593.79k | £373.08k | £209.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS THAT BUILD CAPACITY AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE CULTURAL SECTOR, CREATIVE INDUSTRIES AND IN THE ARTS GENERALLY. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT BY ENCOURAGING PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS, THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERT, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND FESTIVALS AND BY SUPPORTING AND REPRESENTING THE ARTS AND HERITAGE SECTOR THROUGH PROMOTION, REPRESENTATION AND DEVELOPMENT PROVIDED THAT THE PROMOTION OF SUCHLIKE IS UNDERTAKEN SOLELY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE ARTS WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metroland Cultures Ltd
91 Kilburn Square
LONDON
NW6 6PS
- Phone:
- 07896299754
- Email:
- hello@metrolandcultures.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window