Financial history TOPSHAM MUSEUM

Charity number: 1185943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £55.32k £58.69k £69.38k £78.89k £87.52k
Total expenditure £70.03k £83.74k £79.27k £85.71k £76.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.71k £13.53k N/A £350 N/A