Good Neighbours-Rural Peterborough

Charity Number: 1186197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support people in need in the local community in order to improve their quality of life. This support provision includes but is not limited to befriending, transport, domestic support, and household assistance. To develop a sense of mutual support and friendship within the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £99,519
Total expenditure: £73,856

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • RURAL NORTH WEST PETERBOROUGH GOOD NEIGHBOURS SCHEME (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil David Boyce Chair 01 January 2020
None on record
Jane Cave Trustee 01 February 2023
THE NASSINGTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Irene Walsh Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Dorothy Halfhide Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
John Stannage Trustee 01 June 2022
WANSFORD COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
Claire Biggam Bysshe Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Derek Skingle Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
JOAN PICKETT Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
WILLIAM MANTON BAXTER Trustee 01 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST KYNEBURGHA CASTOR WITH UPTON AND STIBBINGTON AND WATER NEWTON
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Lucas Trustee 01 January 2020
BAINTON POOR'S ESTATE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.56k £30.59k £36.82k £99.52k
Total expenditure £10.26k £22.97k £35.74k £73.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.56k £20.93k £26.54k £1.89k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 BENAMS CLOSE
CASTOR
PETERBOROUGH
PE5 7AW
Phone:
07460 817022