THE C.F.A. VOYSEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Voysey Society has been founded to celebrate the life and work of architect and designer Charles Francis Annesley Voysey (1857-1941), one of the leading figures in the Arts and Crafts movement. We operate within the UK. We hold meetings; publish a journal and a newsletter; provide advocacy/advice/information; sponsor or undertake research; make grants to organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2020: Standard registration
- VOYSEY SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Brian Havelock | Chair | 21 September 2024 |
|
|||||
David Anthony Cole | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Graham King | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Woodville Houston Begg | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Kate Mangles Butlin | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Peart | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Harry Butlin BA, FCSD | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Dick-Cleland | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Townshend Sidwell | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.08k | £12.93k | £13.56k | £14.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | £14.43k | £7.61k | £11.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF THE ARTS AND CRAFTS MOVEMENT, AND IN PARTICULAR THE LIFE AND WORK OF ARCHITECT AND DESIGNER CHARLES FRANCIS ANNESLEY VOYSEY, BY (A) PRESERVING THE ORIGINAL CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF VOYSEY’S DESIGNS, BUILDINGS AND OTHER OBJECTS; (B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC SO AS TO INCREASE THEIR APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE DESIGN PHILOSOPHIES AND QUALITIES INVOLVED; AND (C) UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH IN CONNECTION WITH VOYSEY’S WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
393 Gosbrook Road
Caversham
READING
RG4 8ED
- Phone:
- 01628512143
- Email:
- secretary@voyseysociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window