TEMPLE BAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objectives of the Temple Bar Trust are simply: To advance for the public benefit by: Education, knowledge and research in respect of the practice, science, art, history, conservation and preservation of architecture; Education in respect of the architecture and history of the City of London; and Education in respect of the historic structure of Temple Bar, including education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £50,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 28 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gerald Stewart Murray OBE | Chair | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Fraser | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Farida Pilliner-Reeves | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILES ADAM STUART GEORGE MURPHY | Trustee | 27 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Lucy Bullivant | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reynolds | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stephen Waring | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leslie Cooper BArchRIBA | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.92k | £13.64k | £145.01k | £136.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £19.98k | £220.11k | £130.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUN 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUL 2019 as amended on 17 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. EDUCATION, KNOWLEDGE AND RESEARCH IN RESPECT OF THE PRACTICE, SCIENCE, ART, HISTORY, CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF ARCHITECTURE; 2. EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF THE ARCHITECTURE AND HISTORY OF THE CITY OF THE LONDON; AND 3. EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF THE HISTORIC STRUCTURE OF TEMPLE BAR, INCLUDING EDUCATION AS TO THE IMPORTANCE OF ITS PRESERVATION AND USE AND ITS HERITAGE AS THE ARCHITECTURAL GATEWAY TO THE CITY OF LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Temple Bar
Paternoster Lodge
2 Paternoster Square
London
EC4M 7DX
- Phone:
- 07774839078
- Email:
- hello@templebar.london
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window