Financial history LEVEL ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1185505
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £9.74k £13.36k £15.78k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £7.52k £13.15k £11.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.60k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.60k £1.60k