ST MARY & ST THEODORE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, HASTINGS

Charity number: 1185911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian faith of the Coptic Orthodox Church in Hastings, East Sussex by providing a place of worship for members of the Coptic Orthodox Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £124,187
Total expenditure: £24,990

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARY & ST THEODORE COPTIC CHURCH HASTINGS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
His Grace BISHOP ANTONY Chair 16 September 2017
ST. MICHAEL & ST. BISHOY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST ABANOUB COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, WEST AND NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST GEORGE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH PLYMOUTH
Received: On time
ST GEORGE AND ST ATHANASIOUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST. ANTONY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST PETER AND ST PAUL COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH BOURNEMOUTH
Received: On time
ST MARINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH-BRISTOL
Received: On time
ARCHANGEL MICHAEL & SAINT MINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST MOSES THE PROPHET COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, DONCASTER
Received: On time
ST JOHN COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST ATHANASIUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST. ATHANASIUS MONASTERY
Received: On time
St Mary and St John Coptic Orthodox Church and Centre
Recently registered
Thomas James Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Dr Mena ekladious Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Shenouda Hennes-Boulos Trustee 07 March 2020
None on record
Rev ANGELOS ELANTONY FATHER Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Dr Adel Fakhry Shaker Metias Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Dr Magdy Morcos HANNA Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2020 15/09/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.18k £28.96k £483.05k £124.19k
Total expenditure £2.58k £9.11k £16.46k £24.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2021 02 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2021 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 September 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Venue of: St John the Evangilist
Upper Church Road
St Leonards on Sea
TN37 7AT
Phone:
07899795788
Website:

No information available