Trustees SOCIO-LEGAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1186333

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Smita Kheria | Chair | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Simon Cowan | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Professor Rachel Cahill-O'Callaghan | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Caer Smyth | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joy Debski | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arwen Joyce | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Williams | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Hough | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andra le Roux-Kemp | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Powell | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kay Louise Lalor | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kirsten McConnachie | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Raza Saeed | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Giles Green | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Anne Hutton | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Patricia Burton | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elisabeth Rachel Griffiths | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Laurence Howard | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Craven | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Moore LLB | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Jane Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Philip Bremner | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.