THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHIAS, BRIGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities. Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including running Foodbank.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,961 from 3 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 25 September 2019: Standard registration
- ST MATTHIAS, BRIGHTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Thomas James Holbird | Chair | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ISAAC JAMES ATHANASIUS WATSON | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER DENHAM AULD | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr KATHERINE SARAH MIDDLETON | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH-JANE BUYS | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HOLLAND | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUGH GREEN | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA RUTH PROBERT | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
LARRY DEAN ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA LOUISE CHANT | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY MARK HUGO PALMER FRY | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHAUN JONNES | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ADRIAN LOMAS | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATHERINE JENNIFER GARDNER | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE RACHEL PALMER FRY | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MIDDLETON | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BENJAMIN JONES | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURA BATTEN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.83k | £341.38k | £417.74k | £398.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.80k | £352.19k | £388.33k | £405.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.82k | £4.68k | £3.50k | £3.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Matthias Church
360c Ditchling Road
BRIGHTON
BN1 6JG
- Phone:
- 01273239999
- Email:
- info@stmatthiasbrighton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window