ILKESTON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Davies | Chair | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Susan Fetter | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Green | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Thorpe | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Russell Gough | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Marriott | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margarete Lilian Peel | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Kay Wilding | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.52k | £0 | £3.05k | £5.73k | £8.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £2.72k | £4.73k | £4.65k | £5.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT RESIDING IN ILKESTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Third Age Trust
Suite 104
Blackfriars Foundry
154-156 Blackfriars Road
LONDON
SE1 8EN
- Phone:
- 07760966325
- Email:
- chair@ilkestonu3a.org.uk
- Website:
-
ilkestonu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window