Financial history THE FOURTH DIMENSION TRUST

Charity number: 514558
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.89k £19.81k £22.35k £28.08k £18.92k
Total expenditure £36.55k £22.93k £25.80k £29.58k £25.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.10k N/A N/A N/A