CHRIST CHURCH AND ST. JOHN, CLAPHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular Christian worship in accordance with Church of England practice, and the provision of pastoral support to the congregation and to the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 11 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SON JOAN SENGE | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Josephine Olubunmi Enitan Traore-Olorho | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rose Auriol Peake | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rae Grant | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hyacinth Donaldson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucette Esperance Nathalie Ognami | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anabelle Briggs | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olusegun Abayomi Anthony Olutola | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fatmata Jackson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Smith | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.76k | £286.18k | £104.45k | £127.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.18k | £116.60k | £125.22k | £143.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2022 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2022 | 381 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Union Grove
London
SW8 2QJ
- Phone:
- 02074984625
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window