ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES

Charity Number: 1185329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Please see the Report of the Trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Sheena Elizabeth Radford Trustee 11 March 2025
UK DRI LTD
Received: On time
Professor Timothy John Aitman Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Professor Catherine Williamson Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Professor Peter JM Openshaw Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Professor Deborah Ashby Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Professor Sir John Peter Iredale Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Professor Andrew David Morris Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Professor Jugnoo Sangeeta Rahi FMedSci Trustee 05 December 2023
None on record
Professor Michael G Hanna FMedSci Trustee 05 December 2023
None on record
Professor Helen Irene McShane FMedSci Trustee 05 December 2023
None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID JOHN BURN Trustee 05 December 2023
THE UNIVERSITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Rosalind Louise Smyth CBE Trustee 01 November 2023
THE HEALTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LISTER INSTITUTE OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE
Received: On time
Professor David Adams Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Professor Franklin Imo Aigbirhio Trustee 06 January 2023
None on record
Dr Felicity Jane Gabbay Trustee 16 December 2022
None on record
Professor James Henderson Naismith Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Professor Ijeoma Florence Uchegbu Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Professor Kathryn Maitland Trustee 06 December 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE
Received: On time
Professor Tom Solomon Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.65m £14.67m £17.70m £19.07m £20.01m
Total expenditure £17.02m £14.88m £14.19m £16.32m £18.94m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.77m £8.18m £11.50m £12.39m £15.82m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.16m £1.12m £804.40k £1.26m £1.18m
Income - Other trading activities £911.47k £148.10k £725.09k £898.80k £822.11k
Income - Charitable activities £14.42m £13.27m £16.06m £16.72m £17.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £151.64k £125.88k £109.58k £190.85k £497.39k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.23m £14.57m £13.77m £15.57m £18.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £786.06k £302.12k £421.01k £754.06k £668.47k
Expenditure - Governance £142.47k £90.95k £107.06k £442.64k £443.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.36m £10.31m £8.49m £8.79m £10.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £21.55k £26.18k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £4.25m £5.20m £5.00m £4.84m £4.78m
Long-term investments £4.47m £3.69m £3.66m £3.32m £3.54m
Other assets £10.08m £10.69m £11.84m £15.49m £21.02m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.66m £7.20m £4.64m £5.39m £9.78m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (AND IN PARTICULAR THE PEOPLES OF THE MIDDLE EAST) STANDARDS OF EXCELLENCE IN THE RESEARCH AND TEACHING OF MEDICAL SCIENCES AND TO ADVANCE THE PRACTICE OF MEDICINE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN HEALTH AND THE WELFARE PROVIDED NEVERTHELESS THAT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE OBJECTS GIVE PRIORITY TO THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A FUND FOR THE PURPOSE OF FOSTERING ACADEMIC INTERCHANGE BETWEEN MEDICAL AND BIOSCIENCE RESEARCHERS IN AND BETWEEN THE UK AND COUNTRIES OF THE MIDDLE EAST BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS FOR RESEARCH, TRAVEL AND ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Registration history
  • 17 December 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES
41 PORTLAND PLACE
LONDON
W1B 1QH
Phone:
02031413200