INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR RESEARCH ON WOMEN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anchored in the principle of human dignity, ICRW advances gender equity, inclusion and shared prosperity. ICRW works with non-profit, government and private sector partners to conduct research, develop and guide strategy and build capacity to promote evidence-based policies, programs and practices. We are thought leaders driven by a passion to alleviate poverty and rectify injustice in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- India
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
- ICRW UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIMI GREWAL-CARR | Chair | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Mary Goudie | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guy Oliver | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Marijke Jurgens-Dupree | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Naila Kabeer | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENDER EQUALITY AND EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITIES INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): • EDUCATION IN AND RAISING AWARENESS OF GENDER EQUALITY • CONDUCTING RESEARCH AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH • PROMOTING PROJECTS TO IMPROVE GENDER EQUALITY IN BUSINESS AND MONITORING, EVALUATING AND ANALYSING THE RESULTS THEREOF • PROMOTING AND ADVISING ON BEST PRACTICE IN BUSINESS TO PROMOTE GENDER EQUALITY • ADVISING ON POLICY DEVELOPMENT 2) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY PARTICULARLY AMONG SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED WOMEN, GIRLS AND MARGINALISED PEOPLE THROUGH (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN FIELDS SUCH AS HEALTH, NUTRITION, AGRICULTURE AND HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATES WELLS
RIVERSCAPE
10 QUEEN STREET PLACE
LONDON
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 12027421259
- Email:
- info@icrw.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window