THE GALLAGHER LUNEN TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to provide travelling scholarships between the cities for young people of Salford or Lunen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Salford City
- Germany
Governance
- 09 March 1989: Standard registration
- THE LUNEN/SALFORD TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR BILL HINDS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET MORRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR BOB WELSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN SOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM SYKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK ANTROBUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118 | £125 | £125 | £147 | £138 | |
|
Total expenditure | £794 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1984 AND 28 OCTOBER 1988,AS AMENDED 12TH AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIPS BETWEEN TWO CITIES FOR YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 TO 24 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF EITHER THE CITY OF SALFORD OR THE STADT LUNEN.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SALFORD AND STADT LUNEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salford City Council, City Treasure
Civic Centre
Chorley Road
Swinton
MANCHESTER
M27 5AW
- Phone:
- 01617933245
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window