SUNRISE DIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a range of services and activities to celebrate diversity, challenge discrimination and change attitudes in rural communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 November 2020: Standard registration
- NORTH DEVON SUNRISE COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Lockett | Chair | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Mann | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rose Marie Young-French | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Johnstone Mason | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Sophie Maria McCormack | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annemarie Shillito | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|||||
David Nigel Chalmers | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roy Ernest Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.31k | £205.00k | £184.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.81k | £182.91k | £189.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.90k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 MAR 2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN ALL ITS FORMS IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND, PRINCIPALLY IN NORTHERN DEVON, INCLUDING ON THE GROUNDS OF AGE, RACE, ETHNICITY, CULTURE, COUNTRY OF BIRTH, DISABILITY AND/OR PHYSICAL ABILITIES, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER REASSIGNMENT, RELIGION, BELIEF, PREGNANCY AND MATERNITY, MARRIAGE AND CIVIL PARTNERSHIP, OR LIFESTYLE CHOICES; (B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN ISSUES RELATING TO EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER GREATER UNDERSTANDING AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN NORTHERN DEVON. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO: (A) IMPROVE THE SKILLS, CAPACITY AND UNDERSTANDING OF PEOPLE IN SOCIALLY EXCLUDED GROUPS ACROSS NORTHERN DEVON TO ENABLE THEM TO CHALLENGE DISCRIMINATION AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND LOCAL GOVERNANCE SYSTEMS; AND (B) ENGAGE THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN ACTIVITIES TO HELP RAISE AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE AND THE BENEFITS OF A SOCIALLY INCLUSIVE SOCIETY, AND TO ENCOURAGE GREATER PUBLIC ACCEPTANCE OF, AND ENGAGEMENT WITH PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).”
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Castle Centre
25 Castle Street
Barnstaple
Devon
EX311DR
- Phone:
- 01271328915
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window