CHICHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A key part of our mission is to serve our local community and demonstrate the love of Jesus. As well as services on Sundays, we hold a parent/carer toddler group, children's and youth groups, Alpha Courses and a lunch club for older people. We have a Christians Against Poverty office to help any facing debt issues. Our buildings are used by many groups providing services for our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 11 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLEN CAROLINE WILD | Chair | 30 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Bruno Kondabeka | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Emma Cocks | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sean Blaney | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Crossley | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
CALVIN RICHARD HOLLINGWORTH | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Joanne Louise Smith | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Guy Robert Overton Applebee | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Morgan | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|||||
THOMAS GEORGE SNOW | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.29k | £381.15k | £453.36k | £475.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.05k | £358.91k | £400.65k | £489.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHICHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH
124 SHERBORNE ROAD
CHICHESTER
PO19 3AW
- Phone:
- 01243782582
- Email:
- office@chichesterbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window