OLD MAIDSTONIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement of Education of pupils and former pupils of Maidstone Grammar School by: (i) providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school. (ii) by promoting the education by awarding grants for higher or further education or such ways as the Trust trustees think fit by developing such persons mental, physical and moral capabilities through leisure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 14 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John Clayton BA, FCIS | Chair | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Hipkins | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ratcliffe BSc, FIFST | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Gardner Savill Crawley BSc, FICE | Trustee | 13 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9 | £474 | £70 | £19.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £535 | £0 | £539 | £39 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 JUN 2011
Charitable objects
THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND FORMER PUPILS OF MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL BY: (I) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES [NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY] FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (II) BY PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUST TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; (B) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (III) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUST TRUSTEES THINK FIT BY DEVELOPING SUCH PERSONS MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Grammar School
BARTON ROAD
MAIDSTONE
KENT
ME15 7BT
- Phone:
- 01622752101
- Email:
- oms@oldmaidstonians.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window