HENDON ADATH YISROEL CONGREGATION

Charity number: 1187431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancing orthodox Jewish faith for the benefit of the public in such ways as are exclusively charitable in English law & by maintaining & managing the Synagogue known as Hendon Adath Yisroel Cong. Brent Street London NW4 as place of worship prayer & religious study & by providing for the religious needs, spiritual education, pastoral needs & welfare of its members

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Asher Andrew Guttentag Chair 20 January 2020
THE SHERWOOD FOUNDATION CIO
Received: 21 days late
LONDON ACADEMY OF JEWISH STUDIES
Received: On time
HENDON ADATH LIMITED
Received: On time
Jeremy Rowe Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Pini Stimler Trustee 11 September 2022
None on record
Andrew Stimler Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Joseph Katz Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Ricky Darren Noimark Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Benjamin Nathan Rowe Trustee 20 January 2020
HENDON ADATH LIMITED
Received: On time
David Klass Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Shraga Shalom Zaltzman Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
Adrian Mark Jacobs BEM Trustee 20 January 2020
MENORAH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE LAND OF ISRAEL
Received: On time
HENDON ADATH LIMITED
Received: On time
ONE GREAT DAY
Received: On time
THE HUNTINGDON FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
ISRAEL SPECIAL KIDS FUND - UK
Received: On time
DAVID GOLDBERG Trustee 20 January 2020
DELAPAGE LIMITED
Received: On time
RINA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr MAURICE KLAJMAN Trustee 20 January 2020
KEREN ISRAEL PESACH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £875.63k £553.09k £803.28k £1.05m
Total expenditure £460.06k £537.26k £687.95k £659.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £278.32k £59.77k £180.71k £401.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £563.96k £480.30k £622.48k £646.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £153 £6 £92 £162
Income - Other £33.20k £13.02k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £437.76k £510.26k £659.54k £628.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.30k £27.00k £28.41k £30.82k
Expenditure - Governance £4.94k £3.60k £3.60k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £67.47k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £295.52k £313.41k £453.10k £1.23m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £303.16k £280.14k £277.28k £249.75k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £133.12k £112.16k £133.65k £493.77k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HENDON ADATH YISROEL SYNAGOGUE
11 BRENT STREET
LONDON
NW4 2EU
Phone:
02082029183
Website:

No information available