ST GILES PARISH CHURCH WREXHAM

Charity number: 1187287
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Church for Wrexham, part of the Church in Wales; also used for concerts to fundraise ie for the Hospice; hosts school carol services for local schools; provides a lunch club for the elderly; a dementia cafe; "Babes in the Pew" meeting for young mothers and their babies; part of the "Greater Churches Network" meaning that the Church is open, lit and heated almost every day welcoming visitors

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £94,831
Total expenditure: £153,434

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2020: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 16 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1199546 WREXHAM MISSION AREA
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.83k
Total expenditure £153.43k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time