Financial history NATIONAL YOUTH CHOIRS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 515660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £707.61k £1.10m £1.39m £1.53m £1.59m
Total expenditure £752.99k £1.01m £1.45m £1.69m £1.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.78k £4.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £574.68k £613.13k £518.55k £563.55k £601.20k
Income - Other trading activities £780 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £130.51k £483.90k £871.42k £958.47k £985.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.64k £100 £318 £5.34k £4.50k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £32.00k £2.81k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £663.98k £915.57k £1.35m £1.57m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £89.01k £97.53k £94.73k £115.11k £86.65k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.18k £7.82k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0