NATIONAL YOUTH CHOIRS OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 515660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To give the opportunity to groups of young people to perform together in choirs by running residential through the year culminating in the performance of major concerts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NATIONAL YOUTH CHOIR (GREAT BRITAIN) LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas James Shahani-Tuckwell Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Tamsin Verity Anderson Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Siu-Wai Ng Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
DAVID ROPER Trustee 01 May 2021
SOLIHULL SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: 22 days late
LAMDA LTD
Gillian Frances Hillier OBE Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Georgina Alison Robb Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Greg Watson Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Margaret O'Shea Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Michael John Strutt Trustee 25 April 2019
HERITAGE OPERA LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FOUNDATION OF SIR JOHN PERCYVALE IN MACCLESLFIELD OF 1502, RE-FOUNDED BY KING EDWARD VI IN 1552
Received: On time
MACCLESFIELD MUSIC CENTRE
Received: On time
ST MICHAEL'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CATHERINE HEAPY FOR THE MACCLESFIELD NATIONAL SCHOOL
Received: On time
CAROLINE CLULOW HALLET BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS CHURCH, MACCLESFIELD
Received: On time
JAMES OLLEY Trustee 23 January 2018
FUTURE STAGES LTD
Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VEDAST
Received: On time
LONDON HANDEL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.31m £707.61k £1.10m £1.39m £1.53m
Total expenditure £1.24m £752.99k £1.01m £1.45m £1.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.78k £4.08k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £535.39k £574.68k £613.13k £518.55k £563.55k
Income - Other trading activities £19.58k £780 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £747.11k £130.51k £483.90k £871.42k £958.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.29k £1.64k £100 £318 £5.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £48.00k £32.00k £2.81k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £663.98k £915.57k £1.35m £1.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £78.35k £89.01k £97.53k £94.73k £115.11k
Expenditure - Governance £219 £0 £6.18k £7.82k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £74.15k £56.00k £36.33k £16.72k £0
Long-term investments £0 £216.47k £251.64k £389.09k £406.03k
Other assets £771.01k £555.94k £707.30k £428.02k £340.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £182.84k £194.94k £242.64k £151.39k £208.91k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ushaw Historic House
Woodland Road
Ushaw Moor
Durham
DH7 7DW
Phone:
01919160076